Gates et al v. Arcbest II, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher Gates and PJ Gates
Defendant: Arcbest II, Inc. doing business as Arcbest U-Pack
Case Number: 2:2022cv02035
Filed: February 23, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2022 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/28/2022. Jury Trial set for 2/6/2023 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 22, 2022. (jas)
March 22, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Arcbest II, Inc..(Waddell, William)
February 25, 2022 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Arcbest II, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm)
February 25, 2022 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to ARCBEST II, INC., d/b/a ARCBEST U-PACK for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Murphy, Randy)
February 25, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
February 25, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Arcbest II, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2549377), filed by Christopher Gates, PJ Gates.(Murphy, Randy)
February 23, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Christopher Gates, PJ Gates. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gates et al v. Arcbest II, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Gates
Represented By: Randy P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PJ Gates
Represented By: Randy P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcbest II, Inc. doing business as Arcbest U-Pack
Represented By: William A. Waddell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?