Sallee v. Rogers et al
Plaintiff: Gina Sallee
Defendant: Blake Rogers, Tierra, Inc., Jerry Martin, Mark Yardley, City of Alma, Arkansas and John Does 1-8
Case Number: 2:2022cv02155
Filed: September 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Defendant, filed by Gina Sallee. Blake Rogers served on 11/15/2022, answer due 12/6/2022; Tierra, Inc. served on 11/15/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service for Tierra, Inc. upon Registered Agent)(Wyrick, Alexander)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Leon Wyrick on behalf of Gina Sallee. (Wyrick, Alexander)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 8/14/2023 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on November 7, 2022. (jas)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by City of Alma, Arkansas, Jerry Martin, Mark Yardley. (Gibson, Gabrielle)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/7/2022. Jury Trial set for 8/14/2023 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on September 29, 2022. (jas) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/30/2022) (mjm).
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by City of Alma, Arkansas, Jerry Martin, Mark Yardley. (Gibson, Gabrielle)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Removal fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 2024746. (mjm)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATE COURT ANSWER to #4 Complaint by City of Alma, Arkansas, Jerry Martin, Mark Yardley. (Originally filed in the Circuit Court of Crawford County on 09/09/2022)(mjm)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against City of Alma, Arkansas, John Does 1-8, Jerry Martin, Blake Rogers, Tierra, Inc., Mark Yardley, filed by Gina Sallee. (Originally filed in the Circuit Court of Crawford County on 07/26/2022)(mjm)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Crawford County, case number 17CV-22-334., filed by Mark Yardley, City of Alma, Arkansas, Jerry Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Pleadings)(mjm)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by City of Alma, Arkansas, Jerry Martin, Mark Yardley. (mjm)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE in Removal Case re Service of Process directing Plaintiff Gina Sallee to file affidavits of service (or copies of proof of service filed in state court) for defendants who have already been served with summons and a copy of the complaint, and file proof of service in this court regarding defendants to be served in the future. If service is not perfected on a defendant within 90 days after filing the complaint, a show cause order will issue and the complaint against that defendant is subject to dismissal pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(m). (mjm)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 9/30/2022.(mjm)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sallee v. Rogers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Sallee
Represented By: Deeanna Weimar
Represented By: Alexander Leon Wyrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tierra, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Martin
Represented By: Gabrielle Denise Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Yardley
Represented By: Gabrielle Denise Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Alma, Arkansas
Represented By: Gabrielle Denise Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?