Koch v. State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Newton Koch
Defendant: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv02171
Filed: November 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2022 Filing 9 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Bench Trial set for 9/25/2023 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on December 13, 2022. (jas) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/14/2022) (mjm).
December 9, 2022 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company. (Mickel, Alex)
November 9, 2022 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/16/2022. Bench Trial set for 9/25/2023 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on November 9, 2022. (jas)
November 9, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company. (Sugg, Caleb)
November 8, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company.(Mickel, Alex)
November 8, 2022 Filing 4 STATE COURT AMENDED COMPLAINT against Newton Koch, filed by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company.(jlm) Modified on 11/10/2022 (tg).
November 8, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (jlm)
November 8, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Logan County, case number 42PCV-22-96, filed by Newton Koch. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint)(jlm)
November 8, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Newton Koch. (jlm)
November 8, 2022 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (jlm)
November 8, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 11/10/2022 (jlm)
November 8, 2022 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2684848.. (Mickel, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koch v. State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newton Koch
Represented By: Stephen Campbell Smith
Represented By: Eric Lowell Pendergrass
Represented By: Matthew Horan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Alex Mickel
Represented By: Andrew Samuel Tarvin
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Represented By: Caleb Scott Sugg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?