Wire Belt Company of America, Inc. v. ABF Freight System, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wire Belt Company of America, Inc.
Defendant: ABF Freight System, Inc. and ArcBest Corporation
Case Number: 2:2022cv02190
Filed: December 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2023 Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/24/2023. Jury Trial set for 11/20/2023 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Michelle McEntire, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on January 19, 2023. (mjm)
January 18, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Emerson Raines on behalf of ABF Freight System, Inc., ArcBest Corporation. (Raines, Lindsey)
January 18, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by ABF Freight System, Inc., ArcBest Corporation.(Ney, Marshall)
January 12, 2023 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Wire Belt Company of America, Inc.. ABF Freight System, Inc. served on 1/5/2023, answer due 1/26/2023. (Wales, Jason)
January 4, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Wire Belt Company of America, Inc.. ArcBest Corporation served on 12/29/2022, answer due 1/19/2023. (Wales, Jason)
December 16, 2022 Filing 8 ***DISREGARD, document 7 corrected by clerk*** THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to ArcBest Corporation for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Wales, Jason) Modified on 12/16/2022 to disregard (mjm).
December 16, 2022 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to ABF Freight System, Inc., ArcBest Corporation and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (jlm) (Main Document 7 replaced on 12/16/2022) (mjm).
December 16, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wire Belt Company of America, Inc.. (Wales, Jason)
December 16, 2022 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to ArcBest Corporation for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Wales, Jason)
December 16, 2022 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to ABF Freight System, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Wales, Jason)
December 16, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (jlm)
December 16, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against ABF Freight System, Inc., ArcBest Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2703121), filed by Wire Belt Company of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Bill of Lading, #2 Exhibit B: Invoice, #3 Exhibit C: Written Notice of Claim, #4 Exhibit D: Letter)(Wales, Jason)
December 16, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Wire Belt Company of America, Inc.. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (jlm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wire Belt Company of America, Inc. v. ABF Freight System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wire Belt Company of America, Inc.
Represented By: Jason H Wales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABF Freight System, Inc.
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Represented By: Lindsey Emerson Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ArcBest Corporation
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Represented By: Lindsey Emerson Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?