Spiers v. Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: Doyle Spiers
Defendant: Kansas City Southern Railway Company and CPKC
Case Number: 2:2024cv02091
Filed: July 17, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2024 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The new deadline for Defendant to file an answer or other responsive pleading is now September 24, 2024. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 4, 2024. (ee)
September 4, 2024 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kansas City Southern Railway Company. (Norton, C.)
September 4, 2024 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kansas City Southern Railway Company. (Norton, C.)
September 4, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Ryan Norton on behalf of Kansas City Southern Railway Company. (Norton, C.)
August 21, 2024 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Doyle Spiers. Kansas City Southern Railway Company served on 8/21/2024, answer due 9/11/2024. (Sassaman, Shawn)
July 17, 2024 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Kansas City Southern Railway Company and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tmc)
July 17, 2024 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Kansas City Southern Railway Co. for service of the following document: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #2 Complaint. (Sassaman, Shawn)
July 17, 2024 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tmc)
July 17, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Kansas City Southern Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AARWDC-3016822), filed by Doyle Spiers.(Sassaman, Shawn)
July 17, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Doyle Spiers. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (tmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spiers v. Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doyle Spiers
Represented By: Shawn M. Sassaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Represented By: C. Ryan Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPKC
Represented By: C. Ryan Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?