Paxton v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2005cv03064
Filed: December 6, 2005
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2007 14 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 Motion for Attorney Fees in total amount of $795.02. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 5/23/07. (ct)
May 16, 2007 13 RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
May 2, 2007 12 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Hershel J. Paxton, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consumer Price Index# 2 Affidavit of Counsel# 3 Exhibit A - time before SSA & Court# 4 Exhibit A-1 - time before the court)(Spencer, Frederick)
May 2, 2007 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Hershel J. Paxton, Jr. (Spencer, Frederick)
February 6, 2007 10 JUDGMENT remanding case for further consideration, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 2/6/07. cc: ALJ & OH&A w/copy of memorandum opinion(ct) Modified on 2/7/2007 to correct document name (jn).
February 6, 2007 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 2/6/07. (ct)
January 4, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case reassigned to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (tg)
June 12, 2006 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
April 18, 2006 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (jck)
April 14, 2006 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Hershel J. Paxton, Jr. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 3/7/2006, answer due 5/8/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A"# 2 Exhibit "B"# 3 Exhibit "C")(Spencer, Frederick)
April 13, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 5/15/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 6/12/2006. (sh)
April 13, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
March 1, 2006 Case no longer referred to Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Consent to jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge entered. (mfr)
March 1, 2006 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on March 1, 2006. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; #(2) Exhibit-defendant's consent)(djm)
December 6, 2005 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, Attorney General and U. S. Attorney and returned to attorney for service (ct)
December 6, 2005 3 Featured Case ORDER re 1 Complaint, filed by Hershel J. Paxton, Jr., 2 Application to proceed ifp filed by Hershel J. Paxton, Jr.; allowing the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of December 5, 2005,. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 12/6/05. (ct)
December 6, 2005 2 APPLICATION to proceed ifp by Plaintiff Hershel J. Paxton, Jr. (ct)
December 6, 2005 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Hershel J. Paxton, Jr.; filed nunc pro tunc as of December 5, 2005 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of unfavorable decision; # 2 Exhibit B Notice of Apeals Council Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paxton v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?