Copeland v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2006cv03017
Filed: April 5, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2007 9 JUDGMENT re 8 Memorandum Opinion, affirming decision decision of Commissioner and dismissing civil case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on 5/9/07. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
May 9, 2007 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on 5/9/07. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
February 20, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case reassigned to Judge Barry A. Bryant. Judge Bobby E. Shepherd no longer assigned to the case. (tg)
October 24, 2006 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
August 21, 2006 TEXT ONLY Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge Bobby E. Shepherd on August 21, 2006. (bak)
August 21, 2006 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (bak)
August 18, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 9/18/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/17/2006. (rw)
August 18, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
June 29, 2006 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Bobby E. Shepherd. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on 6/29/06. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Consent# 2 Exhibit B - Government's Consent)(cap)
May 2, 2006 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Bobby E. Shepherd. Judge Jones no longer assigned to case. TEXT ONLY ENTRY-NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (jn) Modified on 5/2/2006 to add additional text (jn).
April 5, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney for service (ct)
April 5, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert L. Copeland and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of 4/3/06.. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 4/4/06. (ct)
April 5, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Robert L. Copeland. (ct)
April 5, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Robert L. Copeland; filed nunc pro tunc as of 4/3/06. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of unfavorable decision; # 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals decision)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copeland v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?