Callahan v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2006cv03032
Filed: June 6, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2007 13 JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 12 and granting 9 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Gayle Callahan favor of Gayle Callahan against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 5, 2007. (ct)
September 17, 2007 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Gayle Callahan, Objections to R&R due by 10/4/2007. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on September 17, 2007. (ct)
September 10, 2007 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
September 7, 2007 Judge Barry A. Bryant added. Judge James R. Marschewski no longer assigned to case. (jn)
September 7, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski per motion for attorney fees. (tg)
September 6, 2007 10 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Gayle Callahan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consumer Price Index# 2 Affidavit of Plaintiff# 3 Affidavit of Counsel# 4 Exhibit "A" - time before the court & SSA# 5 Exhibit "A-1" - time before the court)(Spencer, Frederick)
September 6, 2007 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Gayle Callahan. (Spencer, Frederick)
June 13, 2007 8 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 7 and REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCYpursuant to sentence four of 42:405(g). Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on June 13, 2007. (cc: ALJ & OHA with copy of RR)(jn)
May 23, 2007 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint Objections to R&R due by 6/11/2007. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on 5/23/07. (ct)
February 20, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Barry A. Bryant. (tg)
October 23, 2006 6 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
October 23, 2006 Judge Bobby E. Shepherd no longer assigned to case. (jrs)
August 29, 2006 TEXT ONLY Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Bobby E. Shepherd on August 29, 2006. (bak)
August 29, 2006 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (bak)
August 28, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 9/27/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/27/2006. (cnn)
August 25, 2006 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
July 11, 2006 Case reassigned to Judge Bobby E. Shepherd. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to case. (jn)
June 6, 2006 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney for service (ct)
June 6, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed ifp filed by Gayle Callahan, and directing 1 Complaint be filed nunc pro tunc as of 6/1/06.. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 6/2/06. (ct)
June 6, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed ifp by Plaintiff Gayle Callahan. (ct)
June 6, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Gayle Callahan. Filed nunc pro tunc as of June 1, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A notice of decision; # 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Callahan v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?