Storie v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2006cv03033
Filed: June 12, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2007 14 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Fees awarded to Tracy L. Storie against Social Security Administration. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on August 20, 2007. (tg)
August 15, 2007 13 RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
July 31, 2007 12 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Tracy L. Storie. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consumer Price Index# 2 Affidavit of Plaintiff# 3 Affidavit of Counsel# 4 Exhibit "A" time before court & SSA# 5 Exhibit A-1 - time before the court)(Spencer, Frederick)
July 31, 2007 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Tracy L. Storie. (Spencer, Frederick)
May 21, 2007 10 Featured Case ORDER REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY and reversing the decision of the Commissioner pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on May 21, 2007. cc: ALJ & OH&A (tg)
May 21, 2007 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on May 21, 2007.cc: ALJ & OHA (tg) Modified on 5/22/2007 to add cc (jn).
January 4, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case reassigned to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (tg)
October 12, 2006 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
August 29, 2006 7 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on August 29, 2006. (jck)
August 29, 2006 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (jck)
August 28, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 9/27/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/27/2006. (mfr)
August 28, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
July 7, 2006 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on July 7, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; # 2 Exhibit-government's consent)(djm)
June 12, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
June 12, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Tracy L. Storie and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of June 5, 2006. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on June 8, 2005. (tg)
June 12, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Tracy L. Storie. (tg)
June 12, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Tracy L. Storie to be filed nunc pro tunc as of June 5, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision- Unfavorable# 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Storie v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?