McMinns (Bennell) v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2006cv03034
Filed: June 12, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2008 19 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Hazel E McMinns (Bennell) against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Granting 16 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Hazel E McMinns (Bennell), adopting 18 Report and Recommendations, and finding moot 11 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Hazel E McMinns (Bennell). Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 10, 2008. (ct)
November 29, 2007 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending granting 16 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Hazel E McMinns (Bennell), denying as moot 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Hazel E McMinns (Bennell) ( Objections to R&R due by 12/17/2007) This Report and Recommendations cancells the 12/4/07 hearing. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 29, 2007. (ct)
November 26, 2007 17 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 16 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Hazel E McMinns (Bennell). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consumer Price Index, # 2 Affidavit Counsel - time before the court, # 3 Exhibit A-1 - amended time before court)(Spencer, Frederick)
November 26, 2007 16 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Hazel E McMinns (Bennell). Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(Spencer, Frederick)
October 16, 2007 15 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA: Motion Hearing reset for 12/4/2007 01:00 PM in Harrison -- 2nd flr (Rm 231) before Honorable James R. Marschewski. (djm)
October 12, 2007 14 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA: Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2007 03:00 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable James R. Marschewski. (djm)
September 7, 2007 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
August 28, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski for attorney fees. (ct)
August 28, 2007 12 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Hazel E McMinns (Bennell). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consumer Price Index# 2 Affidavit of C'ounsel# 3 Exhibit "A" time before court & SSA# 4 Exhibit "A-1" time before the court)(Spencer, Frederick)
August 28, 2007 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Hazel E McMinns (Bennell). (Spencer, Frederick)
May 30, 2007 10 JUDGMENT (adopting R&R 9 ), reversing decision of commissioner and remanding to commissioner. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on 5/30/07. (ct)
May 9, 2007 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Hazel E McMinns (Bennell), Objections to R&R due by 5/29/2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 5/9/07. (ct)
January 4, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case referred to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (tg)
October 12, 2006 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
August 29, 2006 7 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on August 29, 2006. (jck)
August 29, 2006 6 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. WRONG PDF attached. Please see document 7 ***Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on August 29, 2006. (jck) Modified on 8/29/2006 to add text regarding PDF(mfr).
August 29, 2006 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (jck)
August 28, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT (2 volumes) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 9/27/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/27/2006. (mfr)
August 28, 2006 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
June 12, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
June 12, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER directing that 1 Complaint by Hazel E McMinns (Bennell) be filed and granting 2 Application to proceed ifp, filed by Hazel E McMinns (Bennell). Clerk directed to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of 6/5/06 . Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 6/8/06. (ct)
June 12, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Hazel E McMinns (Bennell). (ct)
June 12, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Hazel E McMinns (Bennell). Filed nunc pro tunc as of 6/5/06. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A notice of decision; # 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMinns (Bennell) v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?