Phillips v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2006cv03046
Filed: July 19, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2007 15 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in amount of $817.27, in favor of Janice L. Phillips against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 29, 2007. (ct)
November 13, 2007 14 RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
October 30, 2007 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Janice L. Phillips. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consumer Price Index# 2 Affidavit of Plaintiff# 3 Affidavit of Counsel# 4 Exhibit "A" - time before court & SSA# 5 Exhibit "A-1" - time before the court)(Spencer, Frederick)
October 29, 2007 12 ***DISREGARD ENTRY. DOCUMENT REFILED AS DOCUMENT #13 TO ATTACH CORRECT PDF MAIN DOCUMENT *** MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Janice L. Phillips. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consumer Price Index# 2 Affidavit of Plaintiff# 3 Affidavit of Counsel# 4 Exhibit "A" - time before the court & SSA# 5 Exhibit "A-1" - time before the court)(Spencer, Frederick) Modified on 10/31/2007 to show refiling(ct).
October 29, 2007 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Janice L. Phillips. (Spencer, Frederick)
August 1, 2007 10 Featured Case ORDER REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY and reversing the decision of the Commissioner for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on August 1, 2007. cc: OHA, ALJ w/copy of MO(tg)
August 1, 2007 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on August 1, 2007. (tg)
January 16, 2007 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 4, 2007 TEXT ONLY - MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (ct)
November 17, 2006 7 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 11/17/2006. (cla)
November 17, 2006 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (cla)
November 16, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 12/18/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/15/2007. (mfr)
November 15, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
November 6, 2006 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on November 6, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Consent; # 2 Government's Consent)(mfr)
July 19, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
July 19, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER granting the 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Janice L. Phillips, and directing that the 1 Complaint filed by Janice L. Phillips be filed nunc pro tunc as of 7/14/06 . Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 7/18/06. (ct)
July 19, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Janice L. Phillips. (ct)
July 19, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Janice L. Phillips. Filed nun pro tunc as of 7/14/06 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision-Unfavorable; # 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?