Jones v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2006cv03052
Filed: September 1, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2008 17 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. in favor of Charles V Jones against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 18, 2008. (ct)
January 14, 2008 16 RESPONSE to Motion re 14 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 7, 2008 15 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 14 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Charles V Jones. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" - time before court & SSA, # 2 Exhibit "A-1" - time before the court, # 3 Affidavit of Counsel, # 4 Affidavit of Plaintiff, # 5 Exhibit Consumer Price Index)(Spencer, Frederick)
January 7, 2008 14 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Charles V Jones. (Spencer, Frederick)
October 25, 2007 13 JUDGMENT REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY for further consideration pusurant to sentence 4 of 42:405(g). Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on October 25, 2007. CC: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
October 25, 2007 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on October 25, 2007. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
April 9, 2007 11 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
March 8, 2007 10 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Charles V Jones. (Spencer, Frederick)
February 7, 2007 9 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 02/07/2007. (caz)
February 7, 2007 8 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (caz)
February 6, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 3/8/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 4/9/2007. (mfr)
February 6, 2007 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
January 4, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case reassigned to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (ct)
December 15, 2006 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on December 15, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Consent; # 2 Government's Consent)(mfr)
September 1, 2006 5 Featured Case ORDER re 1 Complaint, filed by Charles V Jones,, 2 Application filed by Charles V Jones, and 4 Order. Order directing clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of 8/28/06. Order refiled to attach correct document). Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 8/30/06. (ct)
September 1, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
September 1, 2006 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Charles V Jones and directing clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of 8/28/06. (Order refiled to attach correct document) . Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 8/30/06. (ct)
September 1, 2006 3 Featured Case ***DISREGARD ENTRY; INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED***ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Charles V Jones and directing clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of 8/28/06 . Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 8/30/06. (ct) Modified on 9/1/2006 to show re-filing (jn).
September 1, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Charles V Jones. (ct)
September 1, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Charles V Jones. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 8/28/06 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision; # 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct) Modified on 9/1/2006 to add nunc pro tunc text (jn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?