Dyson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2006cv03069
Filed: November 2, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2008 17 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. in favor of Wana F. Dyson against Social Security Administration Commissioner; attorney fees awarded in amount of $1,649.03. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 26, 2008. (ct)
February 21, 2008 16 RESPONSE to Motion re 14 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
February 18, 2008 15 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 14 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Wana F. Dyson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consumer Price Index, # 2 Affidavit of Plaintiff, # 3 Affidavit of Counsel, # 4 Exhibit "A" - time before court & SSA, # 5 Exhibit "A-1" - time before the court)(Spencer, Frederick)
February 18, 2008 14 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Wana F. Dyson. (Spencer, Frederick)
November 26, 2007 13 JUDGMENT REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 26, 2007. (ct) Modified on 11/26/2007 to edit docket text(ct).
November 26, 2007 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 26, 2007. (ct)
April 2, 2007 11 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
March 27, 2007 10 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Wana F. Dyson. (Spencer, Frederick)
March 13, 2007 9 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File and allowing plaintiff until 3/27/07 to file appeal brief . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 3/13/07. (ct)
March 12, 2007 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appeal Brief by Wana F. Dyson. (Spencer, Frederick)
February 9, 2007 7 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 02/09/2007. (cla)
February 9, 2007 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (cla)
February 8, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 3/12/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 4/9/2007. (mfr)
February 7, 2007 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
January 4, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case reassigned to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (ct)
December 28, 2006 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on December 28, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Consent; # 2 Government's Consent)(mfr)
November 2, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Wana F. Dyson and directing clerk to file complaint. . Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 10/30/06. (ct)
November 2, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Wana F. Dyson. (ct)
November 2, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Wana F. Dyson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision; # 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dyson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?