Neal v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2006cv03073
Filed: December 4, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2008 9 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting 5 Motion to Dismiss filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on February 21, 2008. Case is dismissed with prejudice.(tg)
May 31, 2007 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Mark A. Neal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A"# 2 Exhibit "B"# 3 Exhibit "C"# 4 Exhibit "D")(Spencer, Frederick)
May 21, 2007 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Objections to R&R due by 6/7/2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on May 21, 2007. (tg)
May 14, 2007 6 RESPONSE to Motion re 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Mark A. Neal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" Facsimile confirmation# 2 Exhibit "B" Letter to Appeals Council)(Spencer, Frederick)
May 14, 2007 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Earnest Baskerville)(Hawkins, Claude)
January 4, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case referred to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (ct)
December 4, 2006 4 RE-DOCKETED TO CORRECT SCANNING ERROR COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Mark A. Neal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision# 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(tg)
December 4, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Mark A. Neal. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on November 29, 2006. (tg)
December 4, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Mark. A. Neal (tg)
December 4, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
December 4, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Mark A. Neal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision# 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neal v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?