Adams v. Bolen et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv03074
Filed: December 6, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 63 , and Plaintiff's case is dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 28, 2009. (sh)
December 22, 2008 63 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Kelwin Dewayne Adams. Objections to R&R due by 1/12/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 22, 2008. (rw)
September 12, 2008 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety and defendants' 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment is denied with regard to plaintiff's individual capacity claim against defendant Donald Koppenhavener stemming from the 10/27/06 inci dent in which Koppenhavener allegedly aimed a gun at plaintiff and threatened him; further defendants' 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment is granted in all other respects, and plaintiff's remaining claims against Koppenhavener, as well as all of plaintiff's claims against the other three named defendants are dismissed with prejudice; further this matter is referred back to Magistrate Judge Marschewski for further disposition. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 12, 2008. (rw)
September 5, 2007 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion to Reopen Case, finding as moot 23 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on September 5, 2007. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Bolen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?