Henson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Jimmy D. Henson
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2007cv03004
Filed: February 6, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Baxter
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2008 19 Order on Attorney Fees in favor of Jimmy D. Henson against Social Security Administration Commissioner in the amount of $1576.28. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 23, 2008. (jn)
July 21, 2008 18 RESPONSE by Jimmy D. Henson re 15 Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" - Sam Boyce, # 2 Errata "B" - Davis Duty, # 3 Exhibit "C" - Anthony Bartels, # 4 Exhibit "D" - Donald Bishop, # 5 Exhibit "E" - Lewis Huddle, # 6 Exhibit "F" - Bart Virden, # 7 Exhibit "G" - James Roy)(Spencer, Frederick)
June 18, 2008 17 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File his response to the Court Order of 6/11/08 and the plaintiff has until 7/21/08 to respond. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 18, 2008. (jn)
June 17, 2008 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File affidavit regarding prevailing market rates for paralegals by Jimmy D. Henson. (Spencer, Frederick)
June 11, 2008 15 Featured Case ORDER re 12 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA regarding paralegal fees. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 11, 2008. (ct)
June 6, 2008 14 RESPONSE to Motion re 12 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
May 27, 2008 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 12 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Jimmy D. Henson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consumer Price Index, # 2 Affidavit of Plaintiff, # 3 Affidavit of Counsel, # 4 Exhibit "A" - time before court & SSA, # 5 Exhibit A-1 - time before the court)(Spencer, Frederick)
May 27, 2008 12 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Jimmy D. Henson. (Spencer, Frederick)
February 29, 2008 11 JUDGMENT REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY pursuant to sentence four of 42 USC 405(g). Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 29, 2008. (copy to OHA, ALJ)(jn)
February 29, 2008 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 29, 2008. (copy to OHA,ALJ)(jn)
August 29, 2007 9 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
August 14, 2007 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Jimmy D. Henson. (Spencer, Frederick)
August 2, 2007 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Jimmy D. Henson. (Spencer, Frederick)
August 1, 2007 6 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jimmy D. Henson. (Spencer, Frederick)
July 5, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or 8-1-2007. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on July 5, 2007. (mfj)
July 2, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 8/1/2007. Government's SSA Appeal Brief due by 8/31/2007. (mfr)
July 2, 2007 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
June 7, 2007 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Barry A. Bryant. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on 6/7/07. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's consent# 2 Government's Consent)(dkg)
May 3, 2007 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
March 7, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case referred to Judge Barry A. Bryant. Judge James R. Marschewski no longer assigned to the case. (jrs)
February 6, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application filed by Jimmy D. Henson and directing 1 Complaint filed by Jimmy D. Henson, be entered nunc pro tunc as of 1/29/07. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 1/31/07. (ct)
February 6, 2007 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Jimmy D. Henson (ct)
February 6, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Jimmy D. Henson. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 1/29/07 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision; # 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Claude S. Hawkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy D. Henson
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?