Cox v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Kristy A Cox
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2007cv03018
Filed: May 15, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Baxter
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2008 13 Featured Case ORDER adopting the 12 Magistrate's Report and Recommendations in toto and awarding plaintiff's Attorney Fees in the amount of $1,175.03; further this amount shall be paid in addition to, and not out of, any past-due benefits plaintiff may be awarded in the future. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 21, 2008. (rw)
September 16, 2008 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Kristy A Cox. Objections to R&R due by 10/3/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 16, 2008. (lw)
August 18, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(tg)
August 14, 2008 11 RESPONSE to Motion re 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
August 5, 2008 10 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Kristy A Cox. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consumer Price Index, # 2 Exhibit "A" - Sam Boyce affidavit, # 3 Exhibit "B" - Davis Duty affidavit, # 4 Exhibit "C" - Anthony Bartel affidavit, # 5 Exhibit "D" - Donald Bishop affidavit, # 6 Exhibit "E" - Lewis Huddle affidavit, # 7 Exhibit "F" - Bart Virden affidavit, # 8 Exhibit "G" James Roy affidavit, # 9 Affidavit of Plaintiff, # 10 Affidavit of Counsel, # 11 Exhibit "A" - time before the court & SSA, # 12 Errata "A-1" - time before the court)(Spencer, Frederick)
August 5, 2008 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Kristy A Cox. (Spencer, Frederick)
May 7, 2008 8 JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 7 AND REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY. The decision of the Commissioner is reversed. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on May 7, 2008. cc: ALJ & OH&A w/copy of R&R(ct)
April 7, 2008 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Kristy A Cox. Objections to R&R due by 4/24/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 7, 2008. (tg)
November 13, 2007 6 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
October 24, 2007 5 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Kristy A Cox. (Spencer, Frederick)
September 24, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or 10/24/2007. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 09/24/2007. (caz)
September 24, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/24/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 11/23/2007. (sh)
September 21, 2007 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
May 15, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Kristy A Cox. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 5/10/07. (tg)
May 15, 2007 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Kristy A Cox. (tg)
May 15, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Kristy A Cox. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision# 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy A Cox
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?