Sipes v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Cheryl L Sipes
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2007cv03022
Filed: June 1, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Baxter
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2008 21 Featured Case ORDER on Attorney Fees. in favor of Cheryl L Sipes against Social Security Administration Commissioner, in the amount of $1,074.53, pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 USC 2412. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 28, 2008. (sh)
July 29, 2008 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 13 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Cheryl L Sipes. Objections to R&R due by 8/15/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 29, 2008. (ct)
July 21, 2008 19 RESPONSE to 16 Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" = Sam Boyce, # 2 Exhibit "B" - Davis Duty, # 3 Errata "C" - Anthony Bartels, # 4 Exhibit "D" - Donald Bishop, # 5 Exhibit "E" - Lewis Huddle, # 6 Exhibit "F" - Bart Virden, # 7 Exhibit "G" - James Roy)(Spencer, Frederick) Modified on 7/21/2008 to correct link and resend NEF(jn, ).
July 3, 2008 18 Featured Case ORDER granting plaintiff's 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File evidence as set out in the Order. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 3, 2008. (ct)
July 2, 2008 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File evidence regarding paralegal fees by Cheryl L Sipes. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(Spencer, Frederick)
June 27, 2008 16 Featured Case ORDER re 13 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Cheryl L Sipes with directions regarding recovery of paralegal fee. See order for details. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 27, 2008. (ct)
June 23, 2008 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
June 9, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski for ruling on attorney fees. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(ct)
June 9, 2008 14 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 13 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Cheryl L Sipes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consumer Price Index, # 2 Affidavit of Counsel, # 3 Exhibit "A" - time before the court & SSA, # 4 Exhibit "A-1 - time before the court)(Spencer, Frederick)
June 9, 2008 13 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Cheryl L Sipes. (Spencer, Frederick)
March 13, 2008 12 JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 11 AND REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY, granting 10 Motion to Remand filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 13, 2008. cc: ALJ & OH&A w/copy of R&R(ct) Modified on 3/13/2008 to correct docket text(ct).
February 19, 2008 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 MOTION to Remand filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Objections to R&R due by 3/7/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 19, 2008. (jn) Modified on 3/6/2008 to correct signature date (jn).
February 1, 2008 10 MOTION to Remand by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 14, 2008 9 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File and allowing defendant until 2/13/08. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 14, 2008. (ct)
January 11, 2008 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Brief by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(Hawkins, Claude)
December 14, 2007 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Cheryl L Sipes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" - Chronic Pain Article)(Spencer, Frederick)
November 14, 2007 TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or 12/14/2007. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on 11/14/2007. (caz)
November 14, 2007 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Cheryl L Sipes. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 9/11/2007, answer due 11/13/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Service on Regional Chief, # 2 Exhibit B - Service on Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit C - Service on U.S. Attorney)(Spencer, Frederick)
November 13, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 12/17/2007. Government's SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/15/2008. (mfr)
November 13, 2007 5 ANSWER to 3 Complaint, by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
June 5, 2007 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
June 1, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER re 3 Complaint, filed by Cheryl L Sipes, granting 2 Application to proceed ifp, filed by Cheryl L Sipes; directing clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of May 29, 2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 5/30/07. (ct)
June 1, 2007 3 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Cheryl L Sipes. Filed Nunc pro Tunc as of 5/29/07. COMPLAINT REDOCKETED TO ATTACH EXHIBITS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision; # 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct)
June 1, 2007 2 APPLICATION to proceed ifp by Plaintiff Cheryl L Sipes. (ct)
June 1, 2007 1 ***DISREGARD ENTRY; RE-FILED, SEE DOC#3*** COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Cheryl L Sipes. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 5/29/07(ct) Modified on 6/15/2007 to show refiling (jn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sipes v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl L Sipes
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?