Brown v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: George W. Brown
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2007cv03040
Filed: September 10, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Boone
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2009 14 Featured Case ORDER; awarding Attorney Fees in the amount of $1,408.53 in favor of George W. Brown against Social Security Administration Commissioner. This amount should be paid in addition to, and not out of, any past due benefits which plaintiff may be awarded in the future. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on March 19, 2009. (lw)
February 2, 2009 13 Featured Case RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 19, 2009 12 Featured Case MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by George W. Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consumer Price Index, # 2 Exhibit "A" - affidavit of Sam Boyce, # 3 Exhibit "B" - affidavit of Davis Duty, # 4 Exhibit "C" - affidavit of Anthony Bartel, # 5 Exhibit "D" - affidavit of Donald Bishop, # 6 Exhibit "E" - affidavit of Lewis Huddle, # 7 Exhibit "F" - Bart Virden, # 8 Exhibit "G" - James Roy, # 9 Affidavit of Plaintiff, # 10 Affidavit of Counsel, # 11 Exhibit "A" - time before court & SSA, # 12 Exhibit "A-1" - time before the court)(Spencer, Frederick)
January 19, 2009 11 Featured Case MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by George W. Brown. (Spencer, Frederick)
October 21, 2008 10 Featured Case JUDGMENT: REMANDING CASE TO COMMISSIONER for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 USC 405(g). Parties have (60) days from entry of judgment on the docket to appeal. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 21, 2008. (sh)
October 21, 2008 9 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 21, 2008. (sh)
April 2, 2008 8 Featured Case APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
March 3, 2008 7 Featured Case APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by George W. Brown. (Spencer, Frederick)
January 31, 2008 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 3/3/2008.. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on 01/31/2008. (caz)
January 31, 2008 Featured Case This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (rw)
January 31, 2008 6 Featured Case ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
December 19, 2007 5 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint, filed by George W. Brown. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 12/7/2007, answer due 2/5/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A"- Regional Chief, # 2 Exhibit "B" - U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit "C" - U.S. Attorney)(Spencer, Frederick)
December 4, 2007 4 Featured Case CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Honorable James R. Marschewski. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 4, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-plaintiff's consent' # 2 Exhibit-government's consent)(djm)
September 10, 2007 Featured Case 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
September 10, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of August 31, 2007. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on September 10, 2007. (tg) Modified on 9/12/2007 to add text (tg).
September 10, 2007 2 Featured Case APPLICATION/MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by George W. Brown. (tg) Modified on 9/12/2007 to add text(tg).
September 10, 2007 1 Featured Case COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner to be filed nunc pro tunc as of August 31, 2007. (Filing fee $ 350.) filed by George W. Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision - Unfavorable# 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action# 3 Exhibit C Letter dated August 3, 2007)(tg) Modified on 9/12/2007 to add text(tg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George W. Brown
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?