Mealing v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Janet E Mealing
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2007cv03043
Filed: September 26, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Newton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2008 7 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 6 and REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY pursuant to sentence six of 42:405(g). Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on April 23, 2008. (Copy to ALJ & OHA with copy of R/R)(jn)
March 24, 2008 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 MOTION to Remand filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner and 1 Complaint filed by Janet E Mealing. Objections to R&R due by 4/10/2008. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 24, 2008. (tg)
February 29, 2008 5 MOTION to Remand by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 16, 2008 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Janet E Mealing. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 1/2/2008, answer due 3/3/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" - service of Regional Chief, # 2 Exhibit "B" - service of U. S. Atty General, # 3 Exhibit "C" - service of U. S. Attorney)(Spencer, Frederick)
October 12, 2007 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case Reassigned to Judge Barry A. Bryant (Referral). Judge James R. Marschewski no longer assigned to the case. (jn)
September 26, 2007 3Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
September 26, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of September 21, 2007. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on September 24, 2007. (tg)
September 26, 2007 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Janet E Mealing. (tg)
September 26, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner to be filed nunc pro tunc as of September 21, 2007 filed by Janet E Mealing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision - Partially Favorable)(tg) Modified on 9/26/2007 to add text (tg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mealing v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet E Mealing
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?