Elam v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Rosemary Elam
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2007cv03044
Filed: September 28, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Marion
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2008 10 JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 12, 2008. (jn)
March 12, 2008 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 12, 2008. (jn)
March 11, 2008 8 RESPONSE to Motion re 7 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
March 4, 2008 7 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal by Rosemary Elam. (Spencer, Frederick)
February 4, 2008 TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 3/5/2008.Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 4, 2008. (lmg)
February 4, 2008 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (cap)
January 31, 2008 6 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
January 15, 2008 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Rosemary Elam. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 12/20/2007, answer due 2/19/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Service on Regional Chief, # 2 Exhibit B - Service on U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit C - Service on U.S. Attorney)(Spencer, Frederick)
January 4, 2008 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 4, 2008. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Consent, # 2 Government's Consent)(dkg)
October 12, 2007 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case Reassigned to Judge Barry A. Bryant (Referral). Judge James R. Marschewski no longer assigned to the case. (jn)
September 28, 2007 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service w/notice of Availability of Magistrate attached. (ct)
September 28, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Rosemary Elam, and directing that the 1 Complaint filed by Rosemary Elam, be entered nunc pro tunc as of 9/24/07 and that the plaintiffs serve the complaint on defendant as set out in this order. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on September 25, 2007. (ct)
September 28, 2007 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Rosemary Elam. (ct)
September 28, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Rosemary Elam. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 9/24/07 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision; # 2 Exhibit B Notice of Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elam v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Elam
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?