Davis v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Billy J. Davis
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2007cv03047
Filed: October 5, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Boone
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2008 17 Featured Case ORDER adopting the Magistrate's Report and Recommendations in toto and awarding plaintiff attorney's fees in the amount of $3,019.14; further this amount shall be paid in addition to, and not out of, any past-due benefits plaintiff may be awarded in the future. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 19, 2008. (rw)
November 25, 2008 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to EAJA filed by Billy J. Davis. Objections to R&R due by 12/15/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 25, 2008. (rw)
November 18, 2008 15 RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
November 3, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(rw)
November 3, 2008 14 AFFIDAVIT filed by Billy J. Davis Plaintiff's Affidavit and Assignment. (Bishop, Donald)
November 3, 2008 13 AFFIDAVIT filed by Billy J. Davis Plaintiff's Attorney's Affidavit. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney's Itemization of Time)(Bishop, Donald)
November 3, 2008 12 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Motion for EAJA by Billy J. Davis. (Bishop, Donald)
November 3, 2008 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to EAJA by Billy J. Davis. (Bishop, Donald)
November 3, 2008 10 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - WRONG PDF ATTACHED. Refiled as document #11.*** MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to EAJA by Billy J. Davis. (Bishop, Donald) Modified on 11/3/2008 to note refiled(rw).
August 7, 2008 9 JUDGMENT reversing the decision of the Commissioner, REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY and ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on August 7, 2008. cc w/copy of R&R to ALJ & OH&A(ct)
July 15, 2008 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Billy J. Davis. Objections to R&R due by 8/1/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 15, 2008. (ct)
January 14, 2008 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 2, 2008 6 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Billy J. Davis. (Bishop, Donald)
December 4, 2007 TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or 01/02/2008. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on 12/04/2007. (cla)
December 3, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT (2 volumes) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/7/2008. Government's SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/4/2008. (mfr)
December 3, 2007 5 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
October 29, 2007 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of service, filed by Billy J. Davis. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 10/16/2007, answer due 12/17/2007. (Bishop, Donald)
October 5, 2007 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
October 5, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of 10/1/07. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on October 3, 2007. (ct)
October 5, 2007 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Billy J. Davis. (ct)
October 5, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Billy J. Davis. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 10/1/07(ct) Modified on 10/5/2007 to add docket text (ct).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy J. Davis
Represented By: Donald E. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?