Baze v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: William F. Baze
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2007cv03048
Filed: October 12, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Baxter
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2009 14 Featured Case ORDER adopting the Magistrate's 13 recommendations in toto and awarding plaintiff's Attorney Fees in the amount of $1,967.03; further this award should be paid in addition to, and not out of, any past-due benefits plaintiff may be awarded in the future. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 2, 2009. (rw)
February 4, 2009 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by William F. Baze. Objections to R&R due by 2/23/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 4, 2009. (sh)
February 2, 2009 12 RESPONSE to Motion re 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 15, 2009 CASE REFERRED to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(lw)
January 15, 2009 CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(lw)
January 15, 2009 11 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by William F. Baze. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consumer Price Index, # 2 Exhibit "A" - affidavit Sam Boyce, # 3 Exhibit "B" - affidavit Davis Duty, # 4 Exhibit "C" - affidavit of Anthony Bartel, # 5 Exhibit "D" - affidavit of Donald Bishop, # 6 Exhibit "E" - affidavit of Lewis Huddle, # 7 Exhibit "F" - affidavit of Bart Virden, # 8 Exhibit "G" - affidavit of James Roy, # 9 Affidavit of Plaintiff, # 10 Affidavit of Counsel, # 11 Exhibit "A" - time before court & SSA, # 12 Exhibit "A-1" - time before the court)(Spencer, Frederick)
January 15, 2009 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by William F. Baze. (Spencer, Frederick)
October 21, 2008 9 JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and REVERSING AND REMANDING CASE to the Commissioner for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 USC 405(g). Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 21, 2008. (rw) Modified on 10/22/2008 to add text (rw).
September 23, 2008 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by William F. Baze. Objections to R&R due by 10/10/2008. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 23, 2008. (lw)
May 19, 2008 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
April 16, 2008 6 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by William F. Baze. (Spencer, Frederick)
March 17, 2008 TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 4/16/2008.Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 17, 2008. (lmg)
March 17, 2008 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (cap)
March 12, 2008 5 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
February 11, 2008 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by William F. Baze. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 1/29/2008, answer due 3/31/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" - service on Reg. Chief, # 2 Exhibit "B" - service U. S. Atty Gen, # 3 Exhibit "C" - service U. S. Atty)(Spencer, Frederick)
November 14, 2007 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case Reassigned to Honorable Barry A. Bryant as referral judge. Honorable James R. Marschewski no longer associated with case. (jn)
October 12, 2007 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
October 12, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of 10/4/07. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on October 10, 2007. (ct)
October 12, 2007 2 MOTION (Application) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William F. Baze. (ct)
October 12, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by William F. Baze. Filed Nunc Pro Tunc as of October 4, 2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision; # 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baze v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William F. Baze
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?