Harrold v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Johnny L. Harrold
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2007cv03049
Filed: October 17, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2009 14 Featured Case ORDER on Attorney Fees, finding in favor of Johnny L. Harrold in the amount of $1,291.28, pursuant to U.S.C. 42 406(b), and against Social Security Administration Commissioner, and, ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, 13 and, 10 granting the Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Johnny L. Harrold. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 23, 2009. (sh)
September 29, 2009 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Johnny L. Harrold. Objections to R&R due by 10/19/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 29, 2009. (rw) Modified on 10/8/2009 to edit text(rw).
June 10, 2009 12 RESPONSE to Motion re 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
May 28, 2009 CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(lw)
May 27, 2009 MOTIONS REFERRED: 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(lw)
May 27, 2009 11 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Johnny L. Harrold. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consumer Price Index, # 2 Exhibit "A" - affidavit of Sam Boyce, # 3 Exhibit "B" - affidavit of Davis Duty, # 4 Exhibit "C" - affidavit of Anthony Bartel, # 5 Exhibit "D" - affidavit of Donald Bishop, # 6 Exhibit "E" - affidavit of Lewis Huddle, # 7 Exhibit "F" - affidavit of Bart Virden, # 8 Exhibit "G" - affidavit of James Roy, # 9 Affidavit of Plaintiff, # 10 Affidavit of Counsel, # 11 Exhibit "A" - time before court & SSA, # 12 Exhibit "A-1"- time before the court)(Spencer, Frederick)
May 27, 2009 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Johnny L. Harrold. (Spencer, Frederick)
March 2, 2009 9 JUDGMENT adopting the Magistrate's 8 Report and Recommendations in its entirety and reversing and remanding case to the Commissioner for further consideration pursuant to sentence four. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 2, 2009. (rw)
February 9, 2009 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint, filed by Johnny L. Harrold. Objections to R&R due by 2/27/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 9, 2009. (sh)
May 1, 2008 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
April 11, 2008 6 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Johnny L. Harrold. (Spencer, Frederick)
March 12, 2008 TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 4/11/2008.. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on 03/12/2008. (caz)
March 12, 2008 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (jrs)
March 12, 2008 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. TRANSACTION ERROR. REENTERED. This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (mfr) Modified on 3/12/2008 to add docket text (mfr).
March 12, 2008 5 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
March 4, 2008 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Johnny L. Harrold. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 1/29/2008, answer due 3/31/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" - service upon Regional Chief, # 2 Exhibit "B" - service upon U. S. Atty General, # 3 Exhibit "C" - service upon U. S. Attorney)(Spencer, Frederick)
October 17, 2007 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
October 17, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of October 15, 2007. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on October 16, 2007. (tg)
October 17, 2007 2 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Johnny L. Harrold. (tg) Modified on 10/19/2007 to add text(tg).
October 17, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner to be filed nunc pro tunc as of October 15, 2007, filed by Johnny L. Harrold. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision - Unfavorable# 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrold v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny L. Harrold
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?