Goins v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Amanda J. Goins
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2007cv03052
Filed: October 17, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2009 17 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 16 Report and Recommendations in toto, and awarding 13 Attorney Fees filed by Amanda J. Goins in the amount of $1,276.28; Further this amount shall be paid in addition to, and not out of, any past-due benefits plaintiff may be awarded in the future. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on April 14, 2009. (rw)
March 20, 2009 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 13 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Amanda J. Goins. Objections to R&R due by 4/6/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on March 20, 2009. (lw)
February 17, 2009 15 RESPONSE to Motion re 13 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
February 4, 2009 14 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 13 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Amanda J. Goins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consumer Price Index, # 2 Exhibit "A"- affidavit of Sam Boyce, # 3 Exhibit "B" - affidavit of Davis Duty, # 4 Exhibit "C" - affidavit of Anthony Bartel, # 5 Exhibit "D" - affidavit of Donald Bishop, # 6 Exhibit "E" - affidavit of Lewis Huddle, # 7 Exhibit "F" - affidavit of Bart Virden, # 8 Exhibit "G" - affidavit of James Roy, # 9 Affidavit of Counsel, # 10 Exhibit "A" - time before court & SSA, # 11 Exhibit "A-1" - time before the court)(Spencer, Frederick) Modified on 2/5/2009 to edit text(lw).
February 4, 2009 13 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Amanda J. Goins. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(Spencer, Frederick)
November 6, 2008 12 JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and REVERSING and REMANDING CASE to the Commissioner for further consideration pursuant to sentence four. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on November 6, 2008. (rw)
October 15, 2008 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint, filed by Amanda J. Goins. Objections to R&R due by 11/3/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 15, 2008. (lw)
April 16, 2008 10 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
April 9, 2008 9 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant's brief is due 4/16/08. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 9, 2008. (ct)
April 9, 2008 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Brief by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(Hawkins, Claude)
March 10, 2008 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Amanda J. Goins. (Spencer, Frederick)
March 4, 2008 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File a brief (Doc. 6). Plaintiff is granted until March 10, 2008, to file her brief. Counsel is reminded that all motions for extension of time should be filed prior to the date the pleading is due. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on 03/04/2008. (cla)
March 3, 2008 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Brief by Amanda J. Goins. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(Spencer, Frederick)
January 31, 2008 TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 3/3/2008.. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on 01/31/2008. (caz)
January 31, 2008 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (rw)
January 31, 2008 5 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
December 28, 2007 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Amanda J. Goins. Amanda J. Goins served on 12/26/2007, answer due 2/25/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" - Service to Regional Chief, # 2 Exhibit "B" - service to U. S. Atty General, # 3 Exhibit "C" - service to U. S. Attorney)(Spencer, Frederick)
October 17, 2007 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
October 17, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of October 12, 2007. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on October 15, 2007. (tg)
October 17, 2007 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amanda J. Goins. (tg)
October 17, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner to be filed nunc pro tunc as of October 12, 2007, filed by Amanda J. Goins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision - Unfavorable# 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goins v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda J. Goins
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?