Brown v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Vicki D. Brown
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2007cv03053
Filed: October 22, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Harrison Office
County: Baxter
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Vicki D. Brown against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on June 10, 2009. (src)
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 13 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Vicki D. Brown. Objections to R&R due by 6/8/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on May 21, 2009. (rw)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 10 , and this matter is remanded to US Agency for further consideration, pursuant to sentence four of 42 USC 405(g). Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on February 4, 2009. (sh)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint, filed by Vicki D. Brown Objections to R&R due by 1/12/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 23, 2008. (sh)
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing Clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of October 1, 2007, and, also, Clerk is directed to return the in forma pauperis application to plaintiff due to her failure to complete the entire application. Plaintiff has indicated that her husband works but has failed to include information concerning her husband's income. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on October 18, 2007. (tg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki D. Brown
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?