Johnston v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Vivian A Johnston
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2007cv03056
Filed: October 31, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Harrison Office
County: Baxter
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JUDGMENT re 16 Memorandum Opinion, affirming the decision of the Commissioner and dismissing plaintiff's case with prejudice; further parties have 60 days from entry of the judgment on the docket in which to appeal. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 6, 2009. (rw)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 6, 2009. (rw)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Vivian A. Johnston filed by Vivian A Johnston re 14 Order,. (Spencer, Frederick)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, again directing plaintiff to file an affidavit indicating her exact address the date the Complaint was filed on 10/29/07. Plaintiff is to provide this information to the court by 1/6/09. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 17, 2008. (lw)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT filed by Vivian A Johnston re 11 Order,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" - letter to client, # 2 Exhibit "B" - note adv client dropped off application, # 3 Exhibit "C" - application scanned in mail)(Spencer, Frederick)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PLEASE DISREGARD-DUPLICATE DOCUMENT SEE DOCUMENT #11 ORDER: directing plaintiff to file an affidavit indicating her exact current address and her address the date the complaint was filed on October 29, 2007. Plaintiff is to provide this information to the court by December 12, 2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 5, 2008. (sh) Modified on 12/5/2008 (sh).
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an affidavit indicating her exact current address and her address the date the Complaint was filed on October 29, 2007. Plaintiff is to provide this information by December 12, 2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 5, 2008. (lw)
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commission. (Hawkins, Claude) Modified on 5/16/2008 to correct filer(ct).
April 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File brief and allowed until May 21, 2008 to file brief. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 21, 2008. (ct)
April 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Brief by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
March 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Vivian A Johnston. (Spencer, Frederick)
February 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
February 21, 2008 Opinion or Order This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (mfr)
February 21, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 3/24/2008.. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on 2/21/2008. (caz)
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Vivian A Johnston. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 1/3/2008, answer due 3/3/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" - service to Regional Chief, # 2 Exhibit "B" - service to U. S. Atty General, # 3 Exhibit "C" - Service to U. S. Attorney)(Spencer, Frederick)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Honorable James R. Marschewski. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 7, 2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; # 2 Exhibit-government's consent)(djm)
October 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
October 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing that the complaint be filed nunc pro tunc as of 10/29/07. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on October 30, 2007. (ct)
October 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Vivian A Johnston. (ct)
October 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Vivian A Johnston. Filed nunc pro tunc as of October 29, 2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision; # 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnston v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian A Johnston
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?