Barber v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2007cv03065
Filed: December 19, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Attorney Fees. The court finds that the Magistrate's recommendations should be adopted in toto and hereby awards plaintiff's attorney fees in the amount of $2,458.14. This amount shall be paid in addition to, and not out of, any past-due benefits plaintiff may be awarded in the future. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on February 12, 2009. (lw)
November 21, 2008 9 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and reversing and remanding this case to the Commissioner for further consideration, pursuant to sentence four of 42 405(g). 8 ***Civil Case Terminated. Copies of Judgment and Report and Recommendation mailed to Commissioner. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on November 20, 2008. (sh)
October 30, 2008 8 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Nicky J Barber. Objections to R&R due by 11/17/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 30, 2008. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barber v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?