Lamorte v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Christine A. Lamorte
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2008cv03040
Filed: July 9, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
County: Baxter
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for attorney's fees in the amount of $1,522.03 under the EAJA. This amount should be paid in addition to, and not out of, any past due benefits which Plaintiff may be awarded in the future. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 30, 2010. (lw)
November 2, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Reversing the decision of the Commissioner and remanding this case for further consideration, and ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 10 , and 9 . ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on November 2, 2009. (sh)
October 8, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 1 Complaint filed by Christine A. Lamorte. Objections to R&R due by 10/26/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 8, 2009. (sh)
October 6, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Christine A. Lamorte. Objections to R&R due by 10/26/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 6, 2009. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamorte v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine A. Lamorte
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?