Wiley v. Hicks et al

Plaintiff: Isaac Wiley
Defendant: Wayne Hicks and Lori Hicks
Case Number: 3:2008cv03056
Filed: September 26, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Personal Property: Other Office
County: Carroll
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion to Turn Over as set forth. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on June 28, 2011. (lw)
September 29, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED ORDER re 53 Order, as set forth. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 28, 2010. (lw)
September 24, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 23 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 27 Motion to Interplead Receiver's Certificate; granting 30 Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying 38 Motion to Strike; as set forth. Further this Order resolves all claims between the parties in this matter, this case is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 24, 2010. (lw)
March 13, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion to Reopen Case; directing parties to file proposal withing 14 days re further action in case. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 13, 2009. (jrs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiley v. Hicks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Wiley
Represented By: Curtis E. Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?