McFarland v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Keith V. McFarland
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2008cv03067
Filed: December 8, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI Office
County: Baxter
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Attorney Fees in the amount of $1,642.82. This amount should be paid in addition to, and not out of, any past due benefits which Plaintiff may be awarded in the future. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on June 11, 2010. (lw)
March 2, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Reversing the decision of the Commissioner and remanding this case to the Commissioner for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 USC 405(g), and, ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 13 . Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 2, 2010. (sh)
February 3, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Keith V. McFarland. Objections to R&R due by 2/22/2010. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 3, 2010. (sh)
December 18, 2008 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing complaint be filed nunc pro tunc as of 12/4/08. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receip t requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 18, 2008. (lw)
December 8, 2008 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the complaint should be provisionally filed prior to a determination regarding plaintiff's status as a pauper and directing the clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of 12/04/08. Plaintiff's IFP application will be returne d without filing because application requires further clarification. Accordingly, plaintiff is directed to file an amended application on or before 12/22/08. Further service shall not issue in this matter until a completed IFP application has been returned to the court. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 8, 2008. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFarland v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith V. McFarland
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?