Hanson v. Baxter County Arkansas et al

Plaintiff: Tammy Christine Hanson
Defendant: Baxter County Arkansas, John Montgomery, Jeff Lewis, Randall Weaver, Edward Elliott, Linda Henryk, Joseph Tullis, Wilton "Chip&quot Norris, Helen Fenwick, Tony Burch, William Altrazan, Heather Easter, Garnett McMahon, Sherry Lewis, Patrick Gault, James Tudor, Sonya Olnay, John Doe and Deputy Sheriff(s) of Baxter County, Arkansas
Case Number: 3:2010cv03022
Filed: March 8, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2014 266 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Baxter County Arkansas, John Montgomery, Randall Weaver, Tony Beck, and William Altrazan against Tammy Christine Hanson. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on May 19, 2014. (jas)
February 7, 2014 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 160 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 167 Motion for Order; DENYING 172 Motion to Convert to Bench Trial; and DENYING 173 Motion to Continue. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on February 7, 2014. Copy of order mailed to non-CM/ECF participant. (jas)
November 26, 2013 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 156 Motion for Payment of Evidentiary Transcript. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on November 26, 2013. Copy of order mailed to non-CM/ECF participant. (jas)
February 26, 2013 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that parties have until 3/1/2013 to file Objections to 148 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 26, 2013. (lw)
March 12, 2012 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 131 Motion for an Interview with an Inmate Witness; denying as moot 134 Motion for Protective Order. Further granting 140 Motion to Continue, hearing will be rescheduled by separate notice and granting 141 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, Plaintiff has until 4/30/12 to review the discs. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on March 12, 2012. (lw)
February 14, 2012 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Defendants to provide the Court with a copy of their discovery responses by 2/21/12. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 14, 2012. (lw)
February 7, 2012 118 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 116 Order on Motion to Appoint Expert Witnesses. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 7, 2012. (lw)
January 31, 2012 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to provide the journal to Dr. Tullis by no later than 2/9/12. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 31, 2012. (lw)
January 23, 2012 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 81 Pretrial/Prehearing Information Sheet filed by Tammy Christine Hanson, as set forth. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 23, 2012. (lw)
January 19, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 75 Motion to Change Venue; denying 77 Motion for access to CM/ECF; granting 78 Motion to Extend, the plaintiff is given until 1/31/12, to designate her expert witnesses; further granting 79 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 19, 2012. (lw)
September 26, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting 59 Report and Recommendations in toto; as set forth. Further all claims against Patrick Gault, Linda Henry, Jeff Lewis, Sherry Lewis, Sonya Olnay, James Tudor, Heather Easter and Edward Elliott are dismissed. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 26, 2011. (lw)
July 12, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion for Library Access ; denying 27 Motion for Emergency Relief; denying as moot 28 Motion for Hearing; and denying 32 Motion for Emergency Relief. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 12, 2010. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified)(lw)
May 3, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 3 USM285 Form Received from USMS unexecuted return of summons. Plaintiff is directed to provide the court with the correct name of this defendant. If she does not know his correct name, plaintiff should provide the court with all informati on she has regarding him including the shift he worked, the days he worked, whether there were specific incidents involving him for which she knows the date and time, any nickname he had, etc. Plaintiff should provide this information by 5/24/10. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on May 3, 2010. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanson v. Baxter County Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Christine Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter County Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Henryk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Tullis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilton "Chip&quot Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Fenwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Altrazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Easter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garnett McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Gault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Tudor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Olnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Sheriff(s) of Baxter County, Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?