Campbell v. Day et al

Plaintiff: Roger Campbell
Defendant: Jason Day, Jason Silva, Duck and Howard
Case Number: 3:2010cv03031
Filed: April 12, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in toto. Further plaintiff's claims are hereby dismissed. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on June 6, 2011. (lw)
December 13, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion to Compel, plaintiff is directed to provide defendants with the required responses to the discovery requests by 5:00 p.m. on 12/30/10. Further granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File summary judgment motion, new deadline to file a summary judgment will be established once Defendants notify the court they have received the plaintiff's discovery responses. If plaintiff fails to provide the discovery responses, defendants should file a motion to dismiss. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 13, 2010. (lw)
June 3, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing Clerk to assess filing fee and collect funds from Prison Account of Roger Campbell; and DIRECTING SERVICE on Jason Day, Mr. Duck, Mrs. Howard, Jason Silva and granting 21 days to answer. Further the Clerk is directed to make the following corrections on the docket sheet: 1) Mrs. Duck, Jailer should be changed to Mr. Duck, Jailer; and 2) Dr. Howard, Mrs. Jailer should be changed to Mrs. Howard, Jailer. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 3, 2010. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified)(lw)
April 9, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court TRANSFER ORDER finding that the interest of justice will best be served by transferring this case, the Clerk is hereby directed to IMMEDIATELY TRANSFER THIS CASE to the USDC for the Western District of Arkansas, Harrison Division. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/9/10. (vjt) [Transferred from ared on 4/12/2010.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Day et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?