Stebbins v. Mid States Promotions et al

Plaintiff: David Stebbins
Defendant: Mid States Promotions and Jason Jones
Case Number: 3:2010cv03041
Filed: May 10, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Boone
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 02:431
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, that this matter is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on February 23, 2011. (lw)
November 1, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion for Default Hearing and denying 25 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on November 1, 2010. (lw)
September 23, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion and directing clerk to file the motion as a supplement to the complaint. Further, DIRECTING SERVICE on Jason Jones d/b/a Mid States Promotions and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 23, 2010. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified)(lw)
August 17, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Amend; denying 12 Motion to Appoint Expert; denying 14 Motion to file electronically ; and denying 15 Motion to merge cases. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 17, 2010. (lw)
May 26, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 4 Amended Complaint filed by David Stebbins. Plaintiff is directed to state the date on which he maintains he was discriminated against based on his disability and how he was discriminated against. If there were two separate acts of discri mination, one year apart, plaintiff is directed to provide the court with a copy of the second EEOC charge and notice of right to sue. Plaintiff is directed to file a response to the order by 6/4/10. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on May 26, 2010. (lw)
May 10, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing clerk to file 1 Complaint and 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Stebbins. Plaintiff is directed to file amended complaint by 5/31/10, as set forth. Further the clerk is directed to send a blank IFP application to plaintiff to complete and return by 5/31/10 as set forth. Failure to comply with this order will result in the summary dismissal of this case. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on May 7, 2010. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stebbins v. Mid States Promotions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Stebbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid States Promotions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?