Jones v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Jasmin M. Jung Jones
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2010cv03079
Filed: August 18, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Baxter
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Attorney Fees in the amount of $1,866.85. This amount should be paid in addition to, and not out of, any past due benefits which plaintiff may be awarded in the future. Further, adopting 17 Report and Recommendations in its entirety. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on May 9, 2012. (lw)
October 25, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT adopting the 11 Report and Recommendation in its entirety and reversing and remanding case to the Commissioner for further consideration pursuant to sentence four. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on October 25, 2011. (rw)
August 27, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing complaint be filed nunc pro tunc as of 8/17/10. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receip t requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on August 26, 2010. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmin M. Jung Jones
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?