Braden v. Mountain Home School District et al

Plaintiff: Scott Braden
Defendant: Cassie Fowler, Mountain Home School District, Charles Scriber, Debbie Atkinson, Michelle McWilliams and Linda White
Case Number: 3:2010cv03118
Filed: December 8, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Baxter
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:794
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 1, 2013. (jas)
March 26, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE, as set forth. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on March 26, 2013. (lw)
March 12, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 62 Motion for Reconsideration, filed by Debbie Atkinson, Charles Scriber, Cassie Fowler, Mountain Home School District, Linda White, Michelle McWilliams. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on March 12, 2013. (jas)
February 12, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 Defendants' Amended Second Motion for Summary Judgment and denying as moot 55 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on February 12, 2013. (jas)
January 7, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 39 Motion to Amend. A status conference remains set for 1/9/13 at 1:30 p.m. in Fort Smith. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 7, 2013. (lw)
October 18, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on October 18, 2012. (lw)
February 8, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Joint MOTION for Continuance and to Extend Deadlines. Further a revised Scheduling Order will be issued forthwith. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on February 8, 2012. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braden v. Mountain Home School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassie Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Home School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Scriber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Braden
Represented By: Theresa L. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?