Knopick v. Breedlove et al

Plaintiff: Nicholas Knopick
Defendant: William Stahlman, Michael - Breedlove, Jodi Breedlove, Roger Vickers, George Calderia, Marion, County of and Bull Shoals, City of
Case Number: 3:2011cv03010
Filed: February 7, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: Paul K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 2, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. 73 Motion to Dismiss filed by Michael Breedlove and Jodi Breedlove DENIED as set forth. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 2, 2014. (jas)
October 29, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by County of Marion, George Calderia, and Roger Vickers IS DENIED. Defendants Vickers and Calderia are dimissed without prejudice in regard to state charges only. Plaintiff must file an amended complaint within 5 days of this order. Jury trial to be re-set by separate order. Refer to order for further court requirements. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on October 29, 2013. (jas) Modified on 10/29/2013 (jas).
February 27, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S ORDER re 44 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of separate parties, Bull Shoals, City of, including Michael Breedlove, in his official capacity, and William Stahlman, in his individual and official capacities are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Christopher R. Johnson, Clerk, on February 27, 2013. (sh) Modified to edit text on 2/27/2013 (sh).
September 12, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 37 Motion to Lift Stay and denying 19 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Nicholas Knopick, as set forth. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on September 12, 2012. (lw)
January 31, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion to Stay and ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY STAYING CASE. Parties are directed to promptly notify the court once the bankruptcy proceedings have concluded. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 31, 2012. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knopick v. Breedlove et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Stahlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael - Breedlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodi Breedlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Calderia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bull Shoals, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Knopick
Represented By: Joshua M. Autry
Represented By: Dennis E. Boyle
Represented By: Mark D. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?