Worman v. Allstate Indemnity Company

Plaintiff: Amanda M. Worman
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2011cv03033
Filed: April 26, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Baxter
Presiding Judge: Paul K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 85 Motion to Compel as set forth. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on November 19, 2012. (mfr)
November 6, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and denying 52 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on November 6, 2012. (sh)
July 30, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel AS SET FORTH.Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 30, 2012. (sh)
April 23, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on April 23, 2012. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worman v. Allstate Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda M. Worman
Represented By: Nathan Price Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?