Schmid et al v. Lafayette Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Sonrob Hosts, LLC, Robert Schmid and Sonja Schmid
Defendant: Lafayette Insurance Company and Catlin Insurance Company
Counter_claimant: Lafayette Insurance Company and Catlin Insurance Company
Counter_defendant: Robert Schmid, Sonja Schmid and Sonrob Hosts, LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv03094
Filed: October 3, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Carroll
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing and terminating 49 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on November 15, 2012. (sh)
October 26, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Sonrob Hosts, LLC against Lafayette Insurance Company in the amount of $75300.70 and interest at the rate of 0.18% per annum until paid as set forth in the Judgment. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on October 26, 2012. (sh)
September 10, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 27 and 29 Motion in Limine and denying 28 Motion in Limine. The parties can renew any objections at trial. Furthermore, the Court will take up the issue of whether Robert and Sonja Schmid have standing in this matter prior to commencing with trial during the scheduled pretrial conference. Counsel should, therefore, be prepared to argue thestanding issue at that time. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on September 10, 2012. (lw)
August 28, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defendant Lafayette's motion for summary judgment 9 and Catlin Insurance Company is dismissed due to Plaintiffs failure to prosecute, and Catlin Insurance Company is terminated. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 28, 2012. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmid et al v. Lafayette Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonrob Hosts, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Steven Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Schmid
Represented By: Timothy Steven Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja Schmid
Represented By: Timothy Steven Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafayette Insurance Company
Represented By: R. Kenny McCulloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catlin Insurance Company
Represented By: R. Kenny McCulloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Lafayette Insurance Company
Represented By: R. Kenny McCulloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Catlin Insurance Company
Represented By: R. Kenny McCulloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Robert Schmid
Represented By: Timothy Steven Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Sonja Schmid
Represented By: Timothy Steven Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Sonrob Hosts, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Steven Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?