Kiddie v. Copeland et al

Plaintiff: Cheriese Kiddie
Defendant: Johnnie Copeland, Francie A Kiddie and Kipp Woodbury
Case Number: 3:2013cv03030
Filed: February 26, 2013
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Baxter
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2016 125 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 100 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 104 Motion to Either Declare Trust Invalid or Responsible for Decedent's Personal Debts; denying 104 Motion to Stay; denying 109 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Show Cause deadline May 9, 2016; granting 121 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 122 Motion for Disclosure; granting 122 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting 123 Motion for Discovery. Plaintiff is directed to immediately file her amended complaint. An amended scheduling order will be entered rescheduling the jury trial. Kerry Chism is ordered to show cause by May 9, 2016. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on April 27, 2016. (jas) Modified text on 4/27/2016 (jas).
May 5, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 67 Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing claims against Integrity First Bank With Prejudice. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on May 5, 2015. (src)
January 24, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TERMINATING AS MOOT 13 Motion to Dismiss Case and DENYING 15 Motion to Dismiss Case. Refer to the order for further court requirements and deadlines. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 24, 2014. Copy of order mailed to non-CM/ECF participant. (jas)
April 29, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Further, DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Johnnie Copeland, Francie A Kiddie, and Kipp Woodbury. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 29, 2013. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiddie v. Copeland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheriese Kiddie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnnie Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francie A Kiddie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kipp Woodbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?