Brown v. Moore et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Ray Brown
Defendant: Bobby Engalls, Jason Day and Mike Moore
Case Number: 3:2013cv03049
Filed: April 16, 2013
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Boone
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER ADOPTING 56 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 8, 2014. (src)
August 26, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 22 the Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Jail Administrator Jason Day is directed to provide the Court with information as set forth in this Order, This information should be provided to the Court by September 13, 2013. Further the Defendants are dircted to file a summary judgent motion by November 15, 2013. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on August 26, 2013. (sh)
June 27, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion to Amend; granting 16 Motion to Compel; granting 20 Motion to Take Deposition, as set forth. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 27, 2013. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Moore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Engalls
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Day
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Moore
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ray Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?