George et al v. Davis et al

Plaintiff: Alice L. George and First National Bank of North Arkansas
Defendant: Albert M. Davis, David M. Hernon, Suresh Reddy, Tex Wooters, David Tayce, Chase Medical, Inc, Chase Medical Technologies, Inc, Chase Medical Technologies, LP, PHI Health, Inc., PHI Health, LP and John 1-25 Doe
Case Number: 3:2013cv03058
Filed: May 22, 2013
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Carroll
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2015 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 141 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 143 Motion for Default Judgment; and denying 145 Motion to Strike, as set forth. Plaintiffs' claims against KDL Medical, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on February 4, 2015. (jas)
January 28, 2015 156 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 133 Motion to Stay and 137 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion for More Definite Statement, and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; DENYING 135 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; and GRANTING 138 Motion to Dismiss Party. Teasla Partners, LP is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 28, 2015. (jas) Modified document title on 1/28/2015 (jas).
October 1, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 23 Motion for Default Judgment; 25 Motion for Default Judgment; 27 Motion for Default Judgment; 29 Motion for Default Judgment; 31 Motion for Default Judgment; and 33 Motion for Default Judgment as to liability and, in part, as to damages. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on October 1, 2013. (jas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George et al v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice L. George
Represented By: Russell C. Atchley
Represented By: Ashley Rebecca Hudson
Represented By: Todd Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First National Bank of North Arkansas
Represented By: Russell C. Atchley
Represented By: Ashley Rebecca Hudson
Represented By: Todd Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Hernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suresh Reddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tex Wooters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Tayce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Medical, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Medical Technologies, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Medical Technologies, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHI Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHI Health, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1-25 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?