Human Rights Defense Center v. Baxter County, Arkansas et al
Plaintiff: Human Rights Defense Center
Defendant: Baxter County, Arkansas, John Montgomery, Brad Lewis, Eric Neal and Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2017cv03070
Filed: August 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Harrison Office
County: Baxter
Presiding Judge: Timothy L. Brooks
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 117 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 15, 2019. (cnn)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 JUDGMENT DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE re 104 Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 25, 2019. (tg)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion for Summary Judgment (see for specifics). Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 22, 2019. (tg)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 50 Renewed Motion to Dismiss Case; John Montgomery (in his individual and official capacities), Eric Neal (in his individual and official capacities), Does 1-10 (in their individual and official capacities) and Brad Lewis (in his individual and official capacities) are terminated leaving Baxter County as the sole remaining Defendant. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 2, 2018. (tg)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and denying 26 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 5, 2017. (tg)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion to Stay. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 21, 2017. (tg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Human Rights Defense Center v. Baxter County, Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Human Rights Defense Center
Represented By: Paul J James
Represented By: Bruce E. H. Johnson
Represented By: Daniel Marshall
Represented By: Masimba M. Mutamba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter County, Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?