Searcy County School District v. A.M. et al
Plaintiff: Searcy County School District
Defendant: A.M. and J.M.
Case Number: 3:2018cv03077
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Harrison Office
County: Searcy
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 10/31/2018 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on September 5, 2018. (rg)
September 4, 2018 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks: Case Management Hearing held on 9/4/2018. (Dana Hayden-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in Fayetteville-Room 509) (slc)
August 24, 2018 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Searcy County School District. (Kees, William)
August 8, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER/REPLY to #6 Counterclaim by Searcy County School District.(Bequette, George)
July 23, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William Cody Kees on behalf of Searcy County School District. (Kees, William)
July 23, 2018 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 9/4/2018 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/24/2018. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 23, 2018. (slc)
July 20, 2018 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal : $ 400, receipt number 0861-1746247.. (Caldwell, Theresa)
July 19, 2018 Filing 6 COUNTERCLAIM against Searcy County School District, filed by J.M., A.M.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Due Process Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - HO Decision)(Caldwell, Theresa)
July 19, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER filed in State Court to #4 Complaint by Searcy County School District.(tg)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT filed in State Court against A.M., J.M., filed by Searcy County School District.(tg)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished. (tg)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by A.M., J.M. (tg)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Searcy County, Arkansas, case number 65CV-18-23., filed by J.M., A.M. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Documents)(tg)
July 19, 2018 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (tg)
July 19, 2018 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 7/23/2018 (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Searcy County School District v. A.M. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.M.
Represented By: Theresa L. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.M.
Represented By: Theresa L. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Searcy County School District
Represented By: Sharon Carden Streett
Represented By: George J. Bequette, Jr.
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?