Jackson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Ryan C. Jackson
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2018cv03088
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Mark E Ford
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Complaint fee received: $ 400, receipt number 5006831. (tg)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The purpose of 28 U.S.C. 1915 is to ensure that indigent litigants have an entre, not a barrier, to the federal courts. In re Williamson, 786 F.2d 1336, 1338 (8th Cir. 1986) (quoting Souder v. McGuire, 516 F.2d 820, 823 (3rd Cir. 1975)). Although a claimant need not be completely destitute to take advantage of the IFP statute, he or she must show that paying the filing fee would result in an undue financial hardship. Williamson, 786 F.2d at 1338. After review of the application it has been determined that the Plaintiff has adequate assets in the bank to cover the filing fee. Accordingly, Plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed IFP is DENIED. Plaintiff is directed to tender the filing fee of 400.00. Should Plaintiff fail to comply within the required period of time, his/her complaint will become subject to summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order.( Filing Fee due by 10/4/2018); denying #3 Motion for Service; Motions terminated: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service filed by Ryan C. Jackson, #7 MOTION to Amend/Correct 6 Order Provisionally Filing Complaint,, Plaintiff's IFP filed by Ryan C. Jackson. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on September 4, 2018. (cla)
August 23, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct 6 Order Provisionally Filing Complaint,, Plaintiff's IFP by Ryan C. Jackson. (Spencer, Frederick)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: Plaintiff has indicated that he is married, but has provided no information concerning his spouse's employment and income.. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Completed IFP due by 9/13/2018. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on August 23, 2018. (cla)
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Ryan C. Jackson. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Spencer, Frederick)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 9/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(tg)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Ryan C. Jackson. (tg)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Ryan C. Jackson. (tg)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Ryan C. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan C. Jackson
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?