Kirkwood v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Daniel K. Kirkwood
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2018cv03091
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Mark E Ford
2 Judge: Erin L Wiedemann
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 10 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
October 23, 2018 Filing 9 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to U.S Attorney General; Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region VI; U.S Attorney's Office, Western District of Arkansas for service of the following document: #1 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service. (Sackett, Harvey)
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT to a District Judge for entry of the final judgment or order by Daniel K. Kirkwood. (Sackett, Harvey)
September 17, 2018 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable Timothy L. Brooks and Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann, as the referral judge. (lgd)
September 6, 2018 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann. Honorable Mark E. Ford no longer assigned to the case. (mfr)
September 6, 2018 Pro Hac Vice motion filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee, : $ 100, receipt number AARWDC-1775399.. (Sackett, Harvey)
September 5, 2018 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #5 MOTION for Attorney Harvey P. Sackett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 100.00. Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 9/7/2018 (src)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Harvey P. Sackett is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on September 4, 2018. (cla)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit ; granting #2 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on September 4, 2018. (cla)
August 31, 2018 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #5 MOTION for Attorney Harvey P. Sackett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 100.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 9/4/2018 (lw)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney Harvey P. Sackett to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel K. Kirkwood. (lw)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 9/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Reassignment Form)(lw)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Daniel K. Kirkwood. (lw)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Daniel K. Kirkwood. (lw)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Daniel K. Kirkwood.(lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirkwood v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel K. Kirkwood
Represented By: Harvey P. Sackett
Represented By: Harvey P Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?