Crook v. Woods et al
Plaintiff: Tanner Crook
Defendant: Nevada County, AR, Jody Woods and Does All Jailers besides Sergeants and Captains,Boone County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2019cv03039
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Mark E Ford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked RTS Inmate not here. Mail originally sent to Tanner Crook at Boone County Jail including #6 Order Directing Pleading to be Filed and 1983 packet. No new address available. New Address due by 7/24/2019. (tg)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING that an Amended Complaint and Completed IFP be filed. Amended Complaint and Completed IFP due by 7/8/2019. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on June 17, 2019. (src) Modified docket text on 6/18/2019 (mfr).
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (src)
June 12, 2019 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) transferred in from Eastern District of Arkansas. (src)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00382. Docket sheet received.
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to immediately transfer this case to the Western District of Arkansas, Fayetteville Division. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/12/2019. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 6/12/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Tanner Crook. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 6/12/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tanner Crook. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 6/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crook v. Woods et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada County, AR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does All Jailers besides Sergeants and Captains,Boone County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanner Crook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?