Humphrey v. FedEx Freight, Inc.

Plaintiff: Cheri Humphrey
Defendant: FedEx Freight, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv03044
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FedEx Freight, Inc.. (Campbell, Katherine)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 10/1/2019 03:00 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/13/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 1, 2019. (slc)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by FedEx Freight, Inc..(Campbell, Katherine)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Defendant's answer/response is now due on August 1, 2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 8, 2019. (ee)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Church Campbell on behalf of FedEx Freight, Inc.. (Campbell, Katherine)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by FedEx Freight, Inc.. (Ney, Marshall)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (tg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to FedEx Freight, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to FedEx Freight, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Wood, Stephen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against FedEx Freight, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1934737), filed by Cheri Humphrey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights)(Wood, Stephen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Cheri Humphrey. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphrey v. FedEx Freight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheri Humphrey
Represented By: Stephen Lee Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Freight, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Church Campbell
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?