Gatlin v. Goodman

Plaintiff: Perry Joe Gatlin
Defendant: Jared Pointer, Wade, Jason Day, Heath Hudson and Devon Goodman
Case Number: 3:2019cv03052
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Mark E Ford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished and mailed to plaintiff/petitioner. (lgd)
July 16, 2019 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) transferred in from Arkansas Eastern District. (lgd)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00367. Docket sheet received.
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the clerk of the court to immediately transfer Mr. Gatlin's entire case file to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/16/2019. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 7/16/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 ADDENDUM to #4 IFP Motion filed by Perry Joe Gatlin. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 7/16/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Perry Joe Gatlin. (llg) [Transferred from ared on 7/16/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #2 Complaint against All Defendants filed by Perry Joe Gatlin. (llg) [Transferred from ared on 7/16/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Devon Goodman filed by Perry Joe Gatlin. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 7/16/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Perry Joe Gatlin. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 7/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gatlin v. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Joe Gatlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?