Richardson et al v. Omaha School District
Plaintiff: Tonya Richardson and Chad Richardson
Defendant: Omaha School District
Case Number: 3:2019cv03080
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:12133
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 TEXT ONLY NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF PLEADINGS: The following documents were received by the Clerk on 12/11/2019: Administrative Record filed by Chad Richardson, Tonya Richardson containing 4 volumes of transcripts and 4 volumes of joint exhibits. A USB flash drive was also received. USB drive, transcripts and exhibits will be held in the Fayetteville Clerk's Office. (src)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 2/12/2020 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/13/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 2, 2019. (slc)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Omaha School District.(Ney, Marshall)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Chad Richardson, Tonya Richardson. Omaha School District served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email from M. Ney)(Sutton, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Sutton on behalf of Chad Richardson, Tonya Richardson. (Sutton, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Omaha School District and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Omaha School District for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Elrod, John)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Omaha School District ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2009272), filed by Chad Richardson, Tonya Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Due Process Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Parents' Proffer of Excluded Evidence, #3 Exhibit C - Order)(Elrod, John)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Chad Richardson, Tonya Richardson. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson et al v. Omaha School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omaha School District
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Richardson
Represented By: Michael D. Sutton
Represented By: John R. Elrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Richardson
Represented By: Michael D. Sutton
Represented By: John R. Elrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?